Financial history ENSEMBLE PLUS ULTRA

Charity number: 1154312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £7.00k £33.59k £9.53k £2.50k £0
Total expenditure £9.47k £24.44k £14.48k £7.70k £3.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A