Financial history ARDENT FILM TRUST

Charity number: 1148122
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.02k £453 £19.54k £6.70k £0
Total expenditure £1.62k £253 £15.87k £827 £10.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A