The Auckland Project

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Running the Castle: managing the Castle, gardens and parkland - opening to the public. Enhancing the Castle: interpreting existing rooms and paintings, creating new temporary exhibitions,turning the Castle, medieval walled garden and historic parkland into a major heritage attraction, together with Market Place art gallery Creating social impact: jobs, apprentices, volunteers, creative projects
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Cyfanswm incwm:
£14,076,919
Roddion a chymynroddion | £9.57m | |
Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | |
Weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £2.72m | |
Buddsoddiadau | £919.14k | |
Arall | £867.24k |
Cyfanswm gwariant:
£13,700,629
Codi arian | £183.12k | |
Weithgareddau elusennol | £9.57m | |
Arall | £3.95m |
-£62,500 enillion (colledion) buddsoddiadau
Gwariant elusennol
Gwariant elusennol gydag enillion buddsoddi
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Codi arian a Arall Gwariant | £4.13m | |
Gwariant elusennol | £9.57m | |
Cadwyd i'w ddefnyddio yn y dyfodol | £376.29k |
Pobl

137 Gweithwyr
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
468 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nifer y cyflogeion | |
---|---|
£60k i £70k | 2 |
£90k i £100k | 2 |
£140k i £150k | 1 |
£150k i £200k | 1 |
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Hamdden
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Durham
Llywodraethu
- 02 Mawrth 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- THE AUCKLAND CASTLE TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau bwlio ac aflonyddu
- Trin cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheolaethau ariannol mewnol elusen
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau rheoli risg mewnol
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau adrodd am ddigwyddiadau difrifol
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau gwrthdaro buddiannau ymddiriedolwyr
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau treuliau ymddiriedolwyr
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
5 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Bonnar Dean | Ymddiriedolwr | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Nicholas Roderick Holtam | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert John Yorke | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Brendan Godfrey Eamonn Finucane | Ymddiriedolwr | 26 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Anna Marie Lynch | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 July 2019 |
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £17.99m | £11.29m | £6.59m | £7.76m | £14.08m | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £10.30m | £8.00m | £8.24m | £11.80m | £13.70m | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £16.58m | £10.45m | £5.40m | £5.22m | £9.57m | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £319.40k | £100.25k | £190.93k | £1.52m | £2.72m | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £536.70k | £299.08k | £320.36k | £672.24k | £919.14k | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £552.59k | £446.76k | £678.52k | £344.35k | £867.24k | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £9.55m | £7.13m | £6.61m | £8.69m | £9.57m | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | £745.11k | £142.64k | £120.87k | £150.13k | £183.12k | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £34.08k | £26.13k | £35.72k | £60.31k | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | £724.76k | £1.52m | £2.96m | £3.95m |
Asedau a rhwymedigaethau
Diffiniadau ar gyfer asedau a rhwymedigaethau
Asedau yw’r rhain, ac nid buddsoddiadau, a ddelir am fwy na 12 mis ac a ddefnyddir i redeg a gweinyddu’r elusen megis adeiladau, swyddfeydd, arddangosfeydd a gosodiadau a ffitiadau.
Buddsoddiadau Tymor HirBuddsoddiadau yw asedau a ddelir gan yr elusen gyda’r unig nod o gynhyrchu incwm a ddefnyddir ar gyfer eu dibenion elusennol megis cyfrifon cadw, rhanddaliadau, eiddo a rentir ac ymddiriedolaethau unedau.
Ailbrisir asedau buddsoddi bob blwyddyn ac fe’u cynhwysir yn y fantolen ar eu gwerth marchnad cyfredol.
Delir buddsoddiadau tymor hir am fwy na 12 mis.
Asedau yw’r rhain a ddelir yn gyffredinol am lai na 12 mis megis arian parod a balansau banc, dyledwyr, buddsoddiadau i'w gwerthu o fewn y flwyddyn sydd i ddod a stoc masnachu.
Ased neu rwymedigaeth cynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffiniwydArian dros ben neu ddiffyg yw hwn mewn unrhyw gynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffinnir sy’n cael ei weithredu ac mae’n cynrychioli ased neu rwymedigaeth tymor hir botensial.
Cyfanswm rhwymedigaethauDyma’r holl symiau sy’n ddyledus gan yr elusen ar ddyddiad y daflen balans i drydydd partïon megis biliau sy’n ddyledus ond heb eu talu hyd yn hyn, gorddrafftiau banc a benthyciadau a morgeisi.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Asedau hunan ddefnydd | £50.54m | £57.30m | £60.56m | £63.99m | £66.88m | |
|
Buddsoddiadau tymor hir | £1.52m | £1.52m | £1.51m | £1.51m | £2.29m | |
|
Cyfanswm asedau | £35.29m | £31.78m | £27.14m | £19.86m | £16.61m | |
|
Ased neu rwymedigaeth cynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffiniwyd | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm rhwymedigaethau | £1.63m | £1.59m | £1.86m | £2.06m | £2.16m |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 28 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 28 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 22 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 22 Rhagfyr 2023 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 28 Chwefror 2023 | 28 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 28 Chwefror 2023 | 28 diwrnod yn hwyr | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 13 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 13 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 22 Rhagfyr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 22 Rhagfyr 2020 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 OCT 2015 as amended on 29 Oct 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE BENEFITS OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND (IF MORE THAN ONE) IN SUCH SHARES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: 1.1 TO PRESERVE PROTECT AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE CHARITY'S AREA IN PARTICULAR THE CASTLE AND OTHER BUILDINGS OF NATIONAL ARCHITECTURAL HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA TO PROMOTE ACCESS THERETO AND ENJOYMENT THEREOF BY THE PUBLIC AND TO AUGMENT THE AMENITIES OF THE CASTLE AND SUCH OTHER BUILDINGS AND THEIR SURROUNDINGS; 1.2 TO PRESERVE, PROTECT, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE CHARITY'S AREA IN PARTICULAR THE FURNITURE, PICTURES, HISTORICAL RECORDS, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPT, MONUMENTS, ARMOUR, PORCELAIN, SILVER AND GOLD OBJECTS, OBJETS D'ART AND OTHER CHATTELS ASSOCIATED WITH OR DISPLAYED OR KEPT IN THE CASTLE OR IN ANY BUILDING WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA AND TO PROMOTE ACCESS TO AND ENJOYMENT OF SUCH CHATTELS BY THE PUBLIC; 1.3 TO PROMOTE PUBLIC ACCESS TO THE COUNTRYSIDE WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA, THE PROVISION OF ROUTES AND WAYS THEREFORE, AND THE PRESERVATION OF FOOTPATHS, COMMONS AND WASTELANDS; 1.4 TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF MATTERS OF HISTORIC, ARTISTIC, ARCHITECTURAL, CULTURAL OR AESTHETIC INTEREST INCLUDING THOSE CONCERNING THE LANDS AND OTHER PROPERTY COMPRISED IN THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 1.5 TO CONSERVE ANIMAL, BIRD AND PLANT WILDLIFE WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 1.6 TO IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, APICULTURE, FORESTRY AND ALLIED OCCUPATIONS WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA; 1.7 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY WITHIN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE CHARITY'S AREA BY: 1.7.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; AND 1.7.2 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; 1.8 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; 1.9 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES; 1.10 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION WITHIN THE CHARITY'S AREA BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1.10.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 1.10.2 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ORDER TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED; 1.10.3 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; 1.10.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO SUCH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND PROJECTS AS APPROPRIATE; AND/OR 1.10.5 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS WISHING TO DEVELOP ENTREPRENEURIAL AND OTHER SKILLS AND/OR PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR OTHERS; AND 1.11 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HISTORY AND/OR THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF MUSEUMS AND/OR GALLERIES; PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE OR PERMIT THE CHARITY'S FUNDS TO BE PAID OR APPLIED AT ANY TIME OR IN ANY CIRCUMSTANCES FOR ANY PURPOSE OR IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
58 Kingsway
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL14 7JF
- Ffôn:
- 01388743750
- E-bost:
- enquiries@aucklandproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window