Financial history REFUGE FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1146935
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £6.92k £10.83k £7.29k £6.16k £15.38k
Total expenditure £8.87k £10.60k £6.35k £5.29k £14.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0