CYLCH MEITHRIN Y DELYN

Charity number: 1146571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.85k £12.35k £19.02k £12.95k £25.22k
Total expenditure £11.80k £17.30k £18.40k £20.85k £23.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £8.50k
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.50k N/A N/A N/A