ROYAL SOCIETY OF TROPICAL MEDICINE AND HYGIENE

Charity number: 1146162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £391.35k £447.51k £390.19k £342.30k £1.27m
Total expenditure £541.36k £781.11k £795.95k £738.57k £1.54m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £150.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.46k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.17m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £79.04k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.01k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.05k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.35k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.35k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0