ROYAL SOCIETY OF TROPICAL MEDICINE AND HYGIENE

Charity number: 1146162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Janet Hemingway Trustee 21 September 2020 None on record
DOCTOR WENDY HARRISON BVETMED Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR MALCOLM MOLYNEUX OBE,FRCP Trustee 06 September 2017
CHIRAFUND UK Received: On time
Simon Renny Bush Trustee 25 September 2014 None on record
Karen Evans Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Dr Bridget Wills Trustee 21 September 2020 None on record
Dr Gail Jewell Gretel Davey Chair 21 September 2020 None on record
Dr Christopher Parry Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
Timothy Hazell Trustee 21 September 2020 None on record
Professor Diana Lockwood MD,FRCP Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Professor David Mabey CBE Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Dr james whitworth Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record
sarah rafferty Trustee 19 September 2018 None on record
Dr Sharon Cox Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record