YOUTH CLUBS NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 502662
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 08 November 2006 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 08 November 2006 On time
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 December 2005 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 10 February 2006 10 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 15 February 2005 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 21 January 2005 On time