Financial history GILLINGHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £9.96k £14.16k £18.45k £65.31k £88.45k
Total expenditure £10.91k £12.49k £12.59k £13.33k £72.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.00k £1.50k