Accounts and annual returns TATA MEDICAL FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1152324
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 420 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Overdue by 420 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 June 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 June 2022 426 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 September 2020 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required