Trustees TATA MEDICAL FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1152324
Charity reporting is overdue by 414 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ZENOBIA NADIRSHAW Trustee 09 February 2015
EACH COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT
Received: On time
THE WORLD ZOROASTRIAN ORGANISATION LTD
Received: On time
Dr AVIJIT LAHIRI Trustee 26 July 2013
None on record
Dr PETER HARPER Trustee 26 July 2013
None on record
LORD BHIKU CHHOTALAL PAREKH Trustee 26 July 2013
None on record
Sriram Vishwanathan Aylur Trustee 06 June 2013
None on record
SYED ANWAR HASAN Trustee 23 May 2013
None on record
GEETA GOPALAKRISHNAN Trustee 28 February 2012
None on record