Financial history NORFOLK DEAF ASSOCIATION (NDA)

Charity number: 1146883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £231.88k £194.85k £157.51k £238.83k £329.20k
Total expenditure £220.46k £228.33k £285.64k £239.82k £284.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £560