Trustees MIDAYE SOMALI DEVELOPMENT NETWORK

Charity number: 1148304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hinda Dalmar Trustee 18 December 2018
None on record
Mazamed Cabdi Yusuf Trustee 29 January 2018
None on record
Mohamed Hagi Nur Trustee 26 January 2015
None on record
Shukri Warsame Trustee 29 January 2014
None on record
Abdi Nur Trustee 12 January 2014
None on record