Financial history THE PTA OF THE GREEK NURSERY AND PRIMARY SCHOOL OF LONDON

Charity number: 1147422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/05/2020 25/05/2021 25/05/2022 25/05/2023 25/05/2024
Total gross income £2.73k £1.04k £1.99k £2.02k £2.53k
Total expenditure £442 £113 £1.53k £1.66k £2.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A