TAI JI CIRCLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tai Ji Circle run weekly tai chi classes in London (in venue/online Zoom) evenings and Sundays with Master Liu, with twice a month workshops in Chen Taijiquan, Qi Gong and a monthly free session. For adults of all ages, from beginners to advanced classes, our students benefit their health and well being through regular practice. We also hold two free weekly online morning Community Classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Camden
- Islington
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 25 March 2013: Standard registration
- 09 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1078428 ST. PANCRAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- TAI JI CIRCLE, TJC OR TJC LTD (Working name)
- TAI JI CIRCLE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.84k | £55.05k | £37.84k | £31.63k | £36.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.85k | £50.24k | £37.70k | £37.84k | £42.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/03/2013
Charitable objects
2.1 TO PROMOTE THE UNDERSTANDING AND PRACTICE OF TAI JI QUAN, QI GONG AND OTHER CHINESE MARTIAL ARTS FOR THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC IN GENERAL; 2.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF TRADITIONAL CHINESE MASSAGE; AND 2.3 ANY SIMILAR ACTIVITIES RELATING TO THE PROMOTION OF SPORT, HEALTH AND EDUCATION WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window