GEFILTEFEST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Gefiltefest is a new Jewish food charity seeking to change the way the Jewish community thinks about food. We are responsible for a host of food-related events. Gefiltefest supports food redistribution charities in England and overseas. Charities we have supported include Leket Israel, GIFT, and myisrael's Bet Shean Food Bank.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 26 Hydref 2012: Cofrestrwyd
- 22 Hydref 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- THE JEWISH FOOD FESTIVAL (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £38.98k | £42.78k | £21.21k | £4.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £51.73k | £47.24k | £29.42k | £4.24k | £5.00k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 03 Tachwedd 2020 | 3 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 16 Medi 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 27 Medi 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/10/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS OR PROVIDING FINANCE TO REGISTERED CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE PROJECTS A THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR IN THE FOLLOWING (A) EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, FAITH AND CUSTOMS OF THE JEWISH PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING JEWISH CULTURE AND PROMOTING HARMONY BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (B) EDUCATION IN THE PUBLIC IN THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CULTURAL AND NUTRITIONAL ASPECTS OF FOOD AND THE ART OF THE PREPARATION OF FOOD (C) EDUCATION IN THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND STUDY IN SUCH SUBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window