THE CANCER AND BIRTH DEFECTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149441
Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018
Total gross income £670 £0 £144 £60 £60
Total expenditure £1.92k £0 £317 £269 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A