Financial history EFFECTIVE VENTURES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £4.02m £5.87m £14.25m £15.52m £18.64m
Total expenditure £3.66m £3.05m £7.61m £8.59m £14.12m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.02m £5.84m £14.18m £15.02m £18.64m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £70.75k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £137.58k £39.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.23k £1.87k £1.67k £35.63k £34.08k
Income - Other £0 £32.60k £4.18k £325.67k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.66m £3.05m £7.61m £8.59m £14.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.01k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £42.06k £0 £42.99k £821.36k £21.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.59m £1.77m £5.64m £3.50m £7.04m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0