THE ANGLO-ETHIOPIAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required