Financial history THE ANGLO-ETHIOPIAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.59k £5.26k £4.64k £4.03k £3.32k
Total expenditure £4.27k £3.44k £4.80k £2.65k £3.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A