FRIENDS OF OAKTHORPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run fundrasing activities throughtout the school year. Such as children's discos, Summer Fete, Fireworks Night, Christmas Fair
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2019
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Enfield
Governance
- 22 March 2012: Standard registration
- FOO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Ann Garrad | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
NUALA BANNON | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.05k | £13.98k | £13.15k | £14.97k | £14.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £6.51k | £3.26k | £5.30k | £3.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 524 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 524 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 889 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 889 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1254 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1254 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1619 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1619 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oakthorpe Primary School
Tile Kiln Lane
LONDON
N13 6BY
- Phone:
- 02088074689
- Email:
- foo@myoakthorpe.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window