Financial history NOTTINGHAM ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN EDUCATION SERVICE

Charity number: 1149466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £718.69k £886.64k £694.29k £590.59k £595.53k
Total expenditure £715.19k £1.05m £629.37k £538.89k £514.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £761 £178 £0 £2 £0
Income - Other trading activities £54.33k £75.94k £85.67k £32.43k £30.24k
Income - Charitable activities £663.42k £810.26k £607.87k £557.12k £565.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £178 £257 £756 £1.03k £224
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £715.19k £1.04m £629.37k £538.89k £514.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £3.56k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.14k £0 £0 £0