THE FLORENCE TURNER TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees policy is to distribute the charitys income to such charitable purposes as they see fit particulary but not exclusively in Leicester and county smaller local charities are favoured rather than large national ones although local activities of these could be supported. Any grants for individuals are only made through refering agencies like social services, NHS trusts etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 13 June 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BOWDER | Chair |
|
||||||
KATHERINE ELIZABETH ALISON HALL | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL JONES | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.09k | £222.96k | £162.34k | £218.58k | £225.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.78k | £218.77k | £157.69k | £225.82k | £200.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 02 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 02 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 AUGUST 1973
Charitable objects
THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF ARE HELD UPON SUCH CHARITABLE TRUSTS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. IT IS THE INTENTION THAT THE INCOME SHALL BE SO APPLIED IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF LEICESTER OR IN EITHER OF THEM. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF LEICESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shakespeare Martineau
One Colton Square
LEICESTER
LE1 1QH
- Phone:
- 01162574462
- Email:
- helen.pole@shma.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window