ST AGNES ISLAND HALL

Charity number: 1146982
Charity reporting is overdue by 619 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 253 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 253 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 619 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 619 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 March 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 March 2019 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 June 2017 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 09 June 2017 124 days late Download