ST AGNES ISLAND HALL

Charity number: 1146982
Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £21.79k £1.19m £450.34k £10.40k £15.72k
Total expenditure £20.04k £34.17k £13.96k £13.32k £13.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.18m £440.38k £0 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.12k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £5.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.18m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £28.92k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.08k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A