LISKEARD & LOOE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146545
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 August 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 July 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required