THE CATCUDDLES SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1147971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 March 2020 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 March 2020 144 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 March 2020 509 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 March 2020 509 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 March 2020 874 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 March 2020 874 days late Download