Accounts and annual returns INDIA VILLAGE CARE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1147538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window