Accounts and annual returns THE KEVIN BETSY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required