WATFORD MUSLIM YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefit the residents of Watford by associating together the residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 May 2012: Standard registration
- WMYC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAHID MAHMOOD ZARIN | Chair | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sohbat Ali | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannan Mohammed Tabassum | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saiqah Azad | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
IMRAN KHAN | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD MUNIR | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAHOUD RIAZ | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.00k | £51.00k | £392.00k | £54.00k | £64.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.00k | £12.00k | £2.90k | £6.00k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 April 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 April 2022 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2021 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WATFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, RELIGIOUS BACKGROUND, ETHNICITY OR LANGUAGE, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 Mildred Avenue
WATFORD
WD18 7DU
- Phone:
- 07894093248
- Email:
- admin@wmyct.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window