IN HIS PRESENCE FOURSQUARE CHURCH

Charity number: 1148029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.01k £21.67k £25.66k £37.68k £26.20k
Total expenditure £18.56k £21.45k £20.51k £19.24k £21.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A