Accounts and annual returns ST JUDE'S CHURCH, WALSALL

Charity number: 1146782
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 July 2022 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required