Financial history ST JUDE'S CHURCH, WALSALL

Charity number: 1146782
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.46k £7.03k £4.46k £387 £1.01k
Total expenditure £7.19k £5.69k £2.80k £1.34k £4.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A