SKELMANTHORPE COTTAGE HOMES

Charity number: 502744
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Alms House Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £18,800
Total expenditure: £5,421

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Thurlbeck Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Helen Lindley Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Kelvin Lecomber Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
John Stephen O'Brien Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
Joe Gaunt Trustee 18 November 2015
None on record
PETER SENIOR Trustee 28 March 2011
None on record
MARGARET DIANNE HUGHES Trustee
None on record
DAVID IAN FIRTH Trustee
THE LODGE OF PROBITY NO 61 BICENTENARY BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
KATHERINE FIELD Trustee
None on record
STEVEN MARTYN ARTHUR WADSWORTH Trustee
None on record
JEAN ARLENE GAUNT Trustee
None on record
JAMES HEATH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.52k £22.59k £16.80k £19.95k £18.80k
Total expenditure £3.64k £5.64k £15.40k £6.23k £5.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 February 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 May 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 February 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT P.P.R. 28 MARCH 1938
Charitable objects
REPAIRING, REINSTATING AND REVIEWING COTTAGE HOMES AND FURNITURE AND EFFECTS IN THE DISTRICT OF THE URBAN COUNCIL OF SKELMANTHORPE (NOW DENBY DALE)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 16 January 1974 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
11 to 19 Pickles Lane
Skelmanthorpe
HUDDERSFIELD
HD8 9EJ
Phone:
01484600495
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available