Trustees CANAL & RIVER TRUST

Charity number: 1146792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALLAN LESLIE LEIGHTON Chair 24 September 2014
None on record
Clair Jennifer Price Trustee 26 September 2018
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Sarah Whitney Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
SUSAN WILKINSON Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
SIR CHRISTOPHER KELLY KCB Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
Tim Reeve Trustee 22 September 2016
PAINTINGS IN HOSPITALS
Received: On time
DAME JENNY ABRAMSKY DBE Trustee 22 September 2016
THE NATIONAL LIFE STORY COLLECTION
Received: On time
Janet Hogben Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Nigel Annett Trustee 01 June 2016
THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION IN WALES
Received: On time
JOSEPH BENJAMIN GORDON Trustee 24 September 2014
UNITED CHURCH SCHOOLS FOUNDATION LTD
Received: On time
THE UNITED CHURCH SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time