Financial history SWANSEA UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1149941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £7.19m £7.59m £7.38m £5.12m £3.65m
Total expenditure £7.61m £7.58m £7.40m £5.10m £3.43m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £52.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.14m £1.15m £1.15m £1.21m £1.47m
Income - Other trading activities £70.62k £318.04k £409.75k £254.02k £29.84k
Income - Charitable activities £5.85m £6.01m £5.71m £3.31m £1.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.65k £312 £882 £1.67k £0
Income - Other £124.76k £114.43k £111.70k £349.44k £484.82k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.05m £7.21m £7.02m £4.88m £3.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £92.44k £368.61k £380.35k £228.50k £14.48k
Expenditure - Governance £109.92k £111.15k £114.87k £140.61k £148.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0