Trustees SWANSEA UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1149941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Esyllt Rosser Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
Tom Kemp Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Izaak Morris Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Jonathan Davies Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Abigail Egwuatu Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Gwern Ifan Dafis Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Andrew Patton Trustee 24 June 2020
None on record
Riaz Hassan Trustee 19 June 2017
WELSH ISLAMIC CULTURAL ASSOCIATION SWANSEA
Received: On time
HOWARD JOHN MORGAN JP BA BSC Trustee 26 July 2012
None on record