BREATHING SPACE

Charity number: 1148676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Wilcox Trustee 12 March 2013 None on record
PENELOPE MINNEY Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
Bob Dean Trustee 26 June 2014 None on record
STEPHEN JOHN ELLIS Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
BRENDA GILMORE Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
Denis Daggett Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record
Rev William S Jackson Trustee 23 June 2019 None on record
JENNIFER WILCOX Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
NOEL DIXON Chair 12 June 2012 None on record