Accounts and annual returns PADDOCK WOOD COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1147816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window