Financial history PADDOCK WOOD COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1147816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £40.84k £31.36k £42.53k £60.11k £47.66k
Total expenditure £22.30k £37.16k £36.21k £45.60k £38.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.56k £15.13k £24.14k £41.81k £20.91k