Trustees PADDOCK WOOD COMMUNITY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 1147816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIKE MACKENZIE Chair 27 September 2012
None on record
Alison Nicola Cain Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Sarah Ann Hamilton Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Veronica Warner Trustee 03 December 2015
None on record
David Ritchie Trustee 15 July 2015
None on record
MARTIN PENGELLEY Trustee 20 April 2012
None on record