Accounts and annual returns MINISTERIO PALAVRA GENUINA-CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1149096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 15 January 2020 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 15 January 2020 107 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 23 October 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2017 23 days late Download Open in new window