Financial history MINISTERIO PALAVRA GENUINA-CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH LIMITED

Charity number: 1149096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £128.46k £234.09k £167.88k £179.51k £130.12k
Total expenditure £129.23k £239.75k £171.15k £181.99k £134.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A