Financial history Animal Free Research UK

Charity number: 1146896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.44m £1.17m £675.81k £1.51m £1.41m
Total expenditure £1.12m £1.32m £1.10m £720.17k £1.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £165.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.35m £1.15m £663.37k £1.50m £1.39m
Income - Other trading activities £87.31k £9.07k £679 £0 £235
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £15.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.11k £11.10k £11.76k £9.46k £4.88k
Income - Other £1.14k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £970.29k £665.70k £265.34k £998.10k £561.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £840.29k £1.22m £1.09m £462.07k £758.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds £275.73k £104.13k £8.65k £258.10k £290.97k
Expenditure - Governance £27.93k £131.90k £67.85k £35.12k £39.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £417.52k £583.12k £471.36k £55.26k £124.35k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0