Trustees Animal Free Research UK

Charity number: 1146896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Geoffrey John Pilkington Trustee 23 April 2022
None on record
Dr Martin Ashby Trustee 22 November 2021
None on record
Sandra Honess Trustee 24 July 2021
None on record
Michelle chan Trustee 24 July 2021
None on record
Daniel Stephen Cameron Trustee 09 March 2019
None on record
Julia Jones Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
LAURA-JANE SHERIDAN Trustee 28 October 2017
None on record