HEALTH AND EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching and promotion of Yoga Promotion of awareness of various health problems affecting the community and preventing them through education and holistic means and methods. Promotion of physical well being through yoga and meditation Holisitic health support activities such as massage etc Stress relief Promoting healthy life-style for mind and body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Merton
- India
Governance
- 21 December 2012: Standard registration
- KENYTC (Working name)
- KENSINGTON YOGA AND THERAPY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AKSHATA ASHOK KHANDEKAR AKSHATA | Chair | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KUSH KHANDEKAR | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR MAHA BHIDE | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALKA MAHADEO BHIDE MBBS, MD | Trustee | 16 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £650 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £823 | £834 | £828 | £828 | £828 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 February 2025 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES IN MASSAGE, MEDITATION AND YOGA, THERAPEUTIC COUNSELLING AND ADVICE ON DIET AND HEALTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northolt Golf Club Ltd
Huxley Close
Northolt
UB5 5UL
- Phone:
- 02088415550
- Email:
- kyogac@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window