HERBERT WILLIAM MAWER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The H.W.Mawer Trust exists to preserve the Mawer collection of fine and decorative art and antiques,and for the display of the collection at Sion Hill Hall,Kirby Wiske,Thirsk. The principal aim is to make the house and its contents available to the public,and the use of the building for local charitable fund raising events,and as a venue for the local village community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 January 1974: Standard registration
- HERBERT WILLIAMS MAWER TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MICHAEL MALLABY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM RUSBY | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
WILLIAM CALVERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.90k | £83.71k | £66.23k | £76.63k | £76.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.63k | £67.14k | £76.78k | £93.42k | £111.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 OCTOBER 1973. SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 12 AUGUST 1982
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO USE AND PERMIT THE SAME TO BE USED AS AND FOR A MUSEUM OPEN TO THE PUBLIC AT ALL REASONABLE TIMES FOR THE PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE MAWER COLLECTION AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE WHATSOEVER AND SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE MAWER COLLECTION UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSE OF ITS PUBLIC EXHIBITION IN THE MUSEUM PROPERTY.
Area of benefit
KIRBY WISKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
H W MAWER TRUST
SION HILL HALL
KIRBY WISKE
THIRSK
YO7 4EU
- Phone:
- 01845587206
- Email:
- sionhill@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window