Accounts and annual returns ARID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 24 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 04 February 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required