Financial history ARID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £126 £500 £500 £5.00k £5.20k
Total expenditure £0 £100 £300 £4.90k £5.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A