Accounts and annual returns CHINA UK DEVELOPMENT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1149575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2021 31 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2020 31 March 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2019 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2018 05 June 2019 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 03 April 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2017 Not Required